NJ AJR32 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR198
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates February 22 of each year as "Autoimmune Encephalitis Awareness Day."
Title
Designates February 22 of each year as "Autoimmune Encephalitis Awareness Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR198 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee