NJ AJR25 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR123
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, JR-10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, JR-10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes Delaware Bayshore as region of special significance in NJ.
Title
Recognizes Delaware Bayshore as region of special significance in NJ.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr14 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-05 | Senate | Approved P.L.2016, JR-10. |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Substituted for SJR14 |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (65-0-0) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR123 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
SJR14 (Same As) 2016-10-20 - Substituted by AJR25
SJR14 (Same As) 2016-10-20 - Substituted by AJR25