NJ AJR199 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September of each year as "Workforce Development Month."
Title
Designates September of each year as "Workforce Development Month."
Sponsors
Rep. William Moen [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |