NJ AJR175 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Chief Innovation Officer to prioritize enhancement of NJOneApp to include all State anti-hunger programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges Chief Innovation Officer to prioritize enhancement of NJOneApp to include all State anti-hunger programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR110 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2019-02-21SenateSubstituted for SJR110 (1R)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR110 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by AJR175 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback