NJ AJR174 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Commission to Review Impact of COVID-19 on Small Businesses."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Commission to Review Impact of COVID-19 on Small Businesses."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2021-03-01AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
2021-01-13AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-06-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR117 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback