NJ AJR167 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by SJR79 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates commission to study sexual assault, misconduct, and harassment by staff against inmates in State correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates commission to study sexual assault, misconduct, and harassment by staff against inmates in State correctional facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30AssemblySubstituted by SJR79 (1R)
2020-06-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-06-22AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2020-06-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR79 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, JR-3.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback