NJ AJR161 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR59
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR168
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR168
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-27 - Substituted by SJR23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-27 - Substituted by SJR23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October of each year as "First Responders Appreciation Month."
Title
Designates October of each year as "First Responders Appreciation Month."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-27 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR23 |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SJR23 (Same As) 2022-10-31 - Approved P.L.2022, JR-8.
SJR59 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR168 (Carry Over) 2020-06-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
SJR59 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR168 (Carry Over) 2020-06-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/AJR161 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/AJR/161_I1.HTM |