NJ AJR159 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates first full week of June of each year as "Children's Art Week."
Title
Designates first full week of June of each year as "Children's Art Week."
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR159 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/159_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR159 |