NJ AJR154 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR81
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-27 - Substituted by SJR24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-27 - Substituted by SJR24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates second week of November of each year as "National Apprenticeship Week in New Jersey."
Title
Designates second week of November of each year as "National Apprenticeship Week in New Jersey."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-27 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR24 |
2022-10-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR24 (Same As) 2022-11-07 - Approved P.L.2022, JR-9.
SJR81 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
SJR81 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee