NJ AJR144 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR49
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR64
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR147
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR226
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR64
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR147
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR226
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges U.S. Soccer Federation to provide equitable treatment to U.S. Women's National Team.
Title
Urges U.S. Soccer Federation to provide equitable treatment to U.S. Women's National Team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR144 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
AJR144 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
SJR46 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
SJR147 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
AJR226 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
AJR144 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
SJR46 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
SJR147 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
AJR226 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AJR144 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AJR/144_I1.HTM |