NJ AJR141 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR28
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR27
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR27
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates third full week in May as "Roxie's Wish: Drowning Prevention Week for Children."
Title
Designates third full week in May as "Roxie's Wish: Drowning Prevention Week for Children."
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Kean [R] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. DeAnne DeFuccio [R] |
Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Marilyn Piperno [R] | Rep. Kim Eulner [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR141 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR141 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR127 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR141 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR127 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee