NJ AJR139 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November 14th through November 20th as "Transgender Awareness Week."
Title
Designates November 14th through November 20th as "Transgender Awareness Week."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr100 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, JR-22. |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted for SJR100 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (61-5-8) |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR100 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by AJR139
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AJR139 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AJR/139_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR139 |