NJ AJR129 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-27 - Substituted by SJR75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-27 - Substituted by SJR75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October 3rd of each year as "Sergeant Dominick Pilla and Corporal Jamie Smith Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates October 3rd of each year as "Sergeant Dominick Pilla and Corporal Jamie Smith Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR75 |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR75 (Same As) 2018-10-03 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-10.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR129 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/129_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR129 |