NJ AJR122 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR91
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR41
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR62
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR41
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR62
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September 7 through 13 of each year as "Duchenne Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Week" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates September 7 through 13 of each year as "Duchenne Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Week" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR122 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
SJR24 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR41 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SJR62 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR24 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR41 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SJR62 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AJR122 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AJR/122_I1.HTM |