NJ AJR118 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates April of each year as "Financial Literacy Month" in New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates April of each year as "Financial Literacy Month" in New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2019-02-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-12AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback