NJ AJR114 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates last full week of July of each year as "Buy Local Week."
Title
Designates last full week of July of each year as "Buy Local Week."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR77 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, JR-12. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Substituted for SJR77 |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SJR77 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Substituted by AJR114