NJ AJR103 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-31.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-31.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently designates January as "NUT Carcinoma Awareness Month" in New Jersey.
Title
Permanently designates January as "NUT Carcinoma Awareness Month" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR70 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, JR-31. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for SJR70 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR70 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by AJR103
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR103 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/103_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR103 |