NJ AJR100 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR33
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR41
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR41
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates June 2 of each year as "Gun Violence Awareness Day."
Title
Designates June 2 of each year as "Gun Violence Awareness Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-0-0) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR100 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR100 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
SJR88 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR100 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
SJR88 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR100 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/100_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR100 |