NJ A96 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends State construction code to increase fire safety in large residential projects.
Title
Amends State construction code to increase fire safety in large residential projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. John Wisniewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2017-11-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-11-30 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3284 (Same As) 2017-06-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee