NJ A941 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4892
Note: Carry Over of previous S3463
Note: Carry Over of previous S3463
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades unlawful taking thefts in certain instances.
Title
Upgrades unlawful taking thefts in certain instances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4892 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1929 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3463 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1929 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3463 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A941 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/941_I1.HTM |