NJ A889 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2718
Note: Carry Over of previous A5430
Note: Carry Over of previous S3569
Note: Carry Over of previous A5430
Note: Carry Over of previous S3569
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public institutions of higher education to waive tuition and fees for Medal of Honor and Purple Heart Medal military recipients.
Title
Requires public institutions of higher education to waive tuition and fees for Medal of Honor and Purple Heart Medal military recipients.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Bergen [R] | Rep. Edward Thomson [R] | Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Rep. Erik Simonsen [R] |
Rep. Antwan McClellan [R] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] | Rep. Beth Sawyer [R] | Rep. Brandon Umba [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A889 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A5430 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3569 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2551 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A5430 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3569 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2551 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A889 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1000/889_I1.HTM |