NJ A880 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4588

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Combined with A2747 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Limits time continuing care retirement communities may retain refundable

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits time continuing care retirement communities may retain refundable

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05AssemblyCombined with A2747 (ACS)
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4588 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1411 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback