NJ A843 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1770
Note: Carry Foward to future S2034
Note: Carry Over of previous A1310
Note: Carry Foward to future S2034
Note: Carry Over of previous A1310
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires counseling for certain domestic violence offenders.
Title
Requires counseling for certain domestic violence offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A843 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A843 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1310 (Carry Over) 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S649 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A843 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1310 (Carry Over) 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S649 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee