NJ A841 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5121

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.228.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for establishment of county college certificate programs to meet needs of certain regional employers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for establishment of county college certificate programs to meet needs of certain regional employers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S253 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.228.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-06-27SenateSubstituted for S253
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5121 (Carry Over) 2017-07-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S253 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A841

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback