NJ A837 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4961

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.77.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public utility to charge veterans' organization residential rate for service delivered to property at which veterans' organization primarily operates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public utility to charge veterans' organization residential rate for service delivered to property at which veterans' organization primarily operates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2446 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.77.
2018-06-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted for S2446
2018-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-0-0)
2018-06-04AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-12AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4961 (Carry Over) 2017-06-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S2446 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A837 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback