NJ A812 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A662
Note: Carry Foward to future S4151
Note: Carry Over of previous A6067
Note: Carry Over of previous S4344
Note: Carry Foward to future S4151
Note: Carry Over of previous A6067
Note: Carry Over of previous S4344
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notice to be provided by municipal court to applicant for public defender of fee and process to waive fee for inability to pay.
Title
Requires notice to be provided by municipal court to applicant for public defender of fee and process to waive fee for inability to pay.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A812 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A812 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A6067 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S4344 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A812 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A6067 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S4344 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee