NJ A809 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4787

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises law concerning alternate members for farmers on State Agriculture Development Committee.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises law concerning alternate members for farmers on State Agriculture Development Committee.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S255 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2019-05-16AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2019-05-13AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2019-02-21SenateSubstituted for S255 (1R)
2019-01-24SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-31SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2018-05-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
2018-02-15AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-02-01AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4787 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-0)
S255 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A809 (ACS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback