NJ A802 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A654
Note: Carry Over of previous A5346
Note: Carry Over of previous S4322
Note: Carry Over of previous A5346
Note: Carry Over of previous S4322
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.431.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.431.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain retailers to train employees on gift card fraud.
Title
Requires certain retailers to train employees on gift card fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1352 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1352 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.431. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-23-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S1352 (1R) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (64-2-4) |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A802 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.431.
A5346 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1352 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A802 (2R)
S4322 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5346 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1352 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A802 (2R)
S4322 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee