NJ A764 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A191

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Alyssa's Law"; requires public school buildings to be equipped with panic alarm linked to local law enforcement.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Alyssa's Law"; requires public school buildings to be equipped with panic alarm linked to local law enforcement.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S365 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2018-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (38-1)
2018-06-21SenateSubstituted for S365 (2R)
2018-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-05-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (66-6-1)
2018-04-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-12AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A191 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1)
S365 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A764 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback