NJ A725 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires independent State authority member to disclose contractual relationship between authority and authority member's relatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires independent State authority member to disclose contractual relationship between authority and authority member's relatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2017-03-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2016-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

A616 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback