NJ A716 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4147
Note: Carry Over of previous S2955
Note: Carry Over of previous S2955
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows farm operators to accelerate depreciation of certain expenditures under corporation business and gross income taxes.
Title
Allows farm operators to accelerate depreciation of certain expenditures under corporation business and gross income taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4147 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S2955 (Carry Over) 2022-08-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2676 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2955 (Carry Over) 2022-08-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2676 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A716 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1000/716_I1.HTM |