NJ A675 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2843
Note: Carry Foward to future S2856
Note: Carry Over of previous A5369
Note: Carry Over of previous S3766
Note: Carry Foward to future S2856
Note: Carry Over of previous A5369
Note: Carry Over of previous S3766
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOC to report certain information concerning halfway houses.
Title
Requires DOC to report certain information concerning halfway houses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A675 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A675 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5369 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3766 (Carry Over) 2021-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1630 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A675 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5369 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3766 (Carry Over) 2021-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1630 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee