NJ A637 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5938
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.286.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.286.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises permit and license processes for sports pools operators and online sports pool operators; revises definitions of certain sports events; allows for transactional waiver for sports wagering lounge.
Title
Revises permit and license processes for sports pools operators and online sports pool operators; revises definitions of certain sports events; allows for transactional waiver for sports wagering lounge.
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2670 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2670 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.286. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S2670 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5938 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S2670 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A637
S2670 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A637