NJ A6257 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.497.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.497.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes surcharge on casino hotel occupancies to fund public safety services.
Title
Imposes surcharge on casino hotel occupancies to fund public safety services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4311 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4311 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.497. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-9) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S4311 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (63-14-2) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4157 (Same As) 2022-01-06 - Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S4311 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6257 (1R)
S4311 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6257 (1R)