NJ A6162 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.484.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.484.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain motor vehicle dealers to maintain certain requirements for business premises.
Title
Requires certain motor vehicle dealers to maintain certain requirements for business premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4246 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4246 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.484. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S4246 (1R) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4246 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6162