NJ A6014 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4162 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4162 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Climate Change Resource Center at Rutgers University, appropriates up to $500,000.*
Title
Establishes NJ Climate Change Resource Center at Rutgers University, appropriates up to $500,000.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S4162 (2R) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4162 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.442.