NJ A599 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2075
Note: Carry Foward to future S2612
Note: Carry Over of previous A2925
Note: Carry Foward to future S2612
Note: Carry Over of previous A2925
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows modernization for the form of disbursement for certain State government and local unit payments to individuals and business entities.
Title
Allows modernization for the form of disbursement for certain State government and local unit payments to individuals and business entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A599 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A599 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2925 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A599 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2925 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A599 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A1000/599_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A599 |