NJ A5970 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.514.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.514.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY2020 to include new projects, remove certain projects, and modify estimated loan amounts for certain projects.
Title
Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY2020 to include new projects, remove certain projects, and modify estimated loan amounts for certain projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4201 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.514. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S4201 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4201 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5970