NJ A5918 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.513.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.513.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands hospital reporting requirements.
Title
Expands hospital reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3741 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4255 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Reconsidered Vote (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4255 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Reconsidered Vote (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.513. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-1) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3741/4253 (SCS/2R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Weinberg) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Reconsidered Vote (38-0) (Weinberg) Recon. Vote & Sub |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted for S4255 (1R) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-1) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4253 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Combined with S3741 (SCS)
S3741 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5918 (2R)
S3741 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5918 (2R)