NJ A591 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5146

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.50.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits discrimination against cash-paying consumers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits discrimination against cash-paying consumers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2785 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.50.
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-2-0)
2019-01-31AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-01-31SenateSubstituted for S2785 (2R)
2018-12-17SenateSenate Amendment (28-0) (Pou)
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-4-0)
2018-06-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5146 (Carry Over) 2017-08-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2785 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A591 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback