NJ A5890 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2107
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4286 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4286 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies procedures concerning collection of child support on behalf of child over age 19 when court has ordered such support.
Title
Clarifies procedures concerning collection of child support on behalf of child over age 19 when court has ordered such support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S4286 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5890 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4286 (1R)
S4286 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.453.
S4286 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.453.