NJ A5867 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands bonding authority of New Jersey Educational Facilities Authority to permit financing for general funding needs of New Jersey's institutions of higher education.
Title
Expands bonding authority of New Jersey Educational Facilities Authority to permit financing for general funding needs of New Jersey's institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] |
Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S4020 |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4020 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.415.