NJ A5855 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.220.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.220.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DMVA veterans' facilities provide payroll-based journal information to NJ Long-Term Care Ombudsman.
Title
Requires DMVA veterans' facilities provide payroll-based journal information to NJ Long-Term Care Ombudsman.
Sponsors
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Christopher Connors [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3908 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3908 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.220. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3908 |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3908 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5855