NJ A5840 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A199
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.374.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.374.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns joint liability for payment of employer tax law.
Title
Concerns joint liability for payment of employer tax law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4225 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.374. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-14) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S4225 (1R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-22-1) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5840 (Carry Over) 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.374.
S4225 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5840 (2R)
S4225 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5840 (2R)