NJ A584 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1478
Note: Carry Over of previous A3064
Note: Carry Over of previous A3064
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides State agencies will not enter into contracts with business entities that require persons or public entities to submit disputes to binding arbitration.*
Title
Provides State agencies will not enter into contracts with business entities that require persons or public entities to submit disputes to binding arbitration.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A584 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
A3064 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3894 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3064 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3894 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A584 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A1000/584_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A584 |