NJ A5818 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.307.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.307.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for debarment of school bus contractors for certain violations; requires certain information in pupil transportation contract bid.
Title
Provides for debarment of school bus contractors for certain violations; requires certain information in pupil transportation contract bid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3849 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3849 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.307. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3849 (2R) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3849 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5818 (2R)