NJ A5782 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1903
Note: Carry Foward to future A5457
Note: Carry Over of previous S2394
Note: Carry Over of previous A1995
Note: Carry Foward to future A5457
Note: Carry Over of previous S2394
Note: Carry Over of previous A1995
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain ratios of school library media specialist to students in public schools.
Title
Requires certain ratios of school library media specialist to students in public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5782 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5782 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1586 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2394 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1995 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5782 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1586 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2394 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1995 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A5782 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A9999/5782_I1.HTM |