NJ A5769 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3811 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3811 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Kean University as public urban research university.
Title
Establishes Kean University as public urban research university.
Sponsors
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S3811 (1R) |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3811 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.282.