NJ A5741 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2238
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns eligibility, procedures, and post-program relief for certain drug or alcohol dependent persons sentenced to special probation, or regular probation which as a condition of such requires substance use disorders treatment.
Title
Concerns eligibility, procedures, and post-program relief for certain drug or alcohol dependent persons sentenced to special probation, or regular probation which as a condition of such requires substance use disorders treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5741 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S241 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S491 (Same As) 2020-03-19 - Combined with S241 (SCS)
S241 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S491 (Same As) 2020-03-19 - Combined with S241 (SCS)