NJ A5727 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2072
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.365.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.365.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures student well-being during school security drills.
Title
Ensures student well-being during school security drills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3726 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3726 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.365. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3726 (2R) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5727 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.365.
S3726 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5727 (1R)
S3726 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5727 (1R)